WV HB4645 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - Senate requests House to concur
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the Office of Regulatory and Fiscal Affairs under the Joint Committee on Government and Finance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Office of Regulatory and Fiscal Affairs under the Joint Committee on Government and Finance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 560) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 286) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-07SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 560)
2020-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-07SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-03-06SenateCommittee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-06SenateAmendments to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-06SenateCommittee Amendment Reported
2020-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-06SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-05SenateReported do pass, with amendments and title amendment
2020-03-02SenateOn 2nd reading to Finance
2020-03-02SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-02SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-02SenateReported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance
2020-02-24SenateTo Government Organization
2020-02-24SenateTo Government Organization then Finance
2020-02-24SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-21HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-21HousePassed House (Roll No. 286)
2020-02-21HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-21HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-20HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-20HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-19HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-19HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-18HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-02-03HouseTo House Government Organization
2020-02-03HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-03HouseTo Government Organization
2020-02-03HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
421Amended CodeCitation Text
424Amended CodeCitation Text
426aNew CodeSee Bill Text
433cAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback