WV HB4634 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 213, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 213, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to occupational licensing or other authorization to practice
Title
Relating to occupational licensing or other authorization to practice
Sponsors
Del. Paul Espinosa [R] | Del. Geoff Foster [R] | Del. Brandon Steele [R] | Del. Carl Martin [R] |
Del. Roland Jennings [R] | Del. Chuck Horst [R] | Del. Adam Burkhammer [R] | Del. Josh Holstein [R] |
Del. Gary Howell [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 478) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Romano floor amendment #2 rejected (Roll No. 477) (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Romano floor amendment #1 rejected (Roll No. 476) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Lindsay floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 475) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 250) (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Romano floor amendment #2 rejected (Roll No. 477) (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Romano floor amendment #1 rejected (Roll No. 476) (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Lindsay floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 475) (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 250) (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 213, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-24 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/24/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 478) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Romano floor amendment #2 rejected (Roll No. 477) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Romano floor amendment #1 rejected (Roll No. 476) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Lindsay floor amendment rejected (Roll No. 475) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 3rd reading |
2022-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-28 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-28 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 250) |
2022-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-02-10 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-10 | House | To Government Organization |
2022-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 17 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 17 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 17 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 17 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 17 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 17 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 17 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 17 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 17 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 17 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 17 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 17 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 33 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 33 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 33 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 33 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 33 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 33 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 33 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 33 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 33 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 33 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 33 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 33 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |