WV HB4618 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-27 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Status: Introduced on February 18 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-27 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to regulate the business of viatical settlements between insureds and viatical settlement companies with respect to life insurance policies. This bill will regulate how the company will operate its business; will require licensing of the company, as well as its brokers; and help to limit fraudulent practices.
Title
Viatical Settlements Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-27 | Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-27 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-26 | Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/27/08 | |
2008-02-26 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-25 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-24 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-24 | Do pass | |
2008-02-18 | To House Finance | |
2008-02-18 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-18 | To Finance | |
2008-02-18 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB704 (Same As) 2008-04-08 - Chapter 124, Acts, Regular Session, 2008
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4618&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |