WV HB4614 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - To Pensions
Pending: Senate Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - To Pensions
Pending: Senate Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing optional retirement service credit for unused accrued annual or sick leave days for municipal police and firefighters
Title
Providing optional retirement service credit for unused accrued annual or sick leave days for municipal police and firefighters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 268) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | To Pensions |
2022-03-01 | Senate | To Pensions then Finance |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 268) |
2022-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-02-15 | House | To House Finance |
2022-02-15 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-02-10 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-10 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2022-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |