WV HB4582 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Chapter 169, Acts, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Chapter 169, Acts, 2010
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create reciprocity for West Virginia small, women and minority-owned businesses who receive such preferences in other states.
Title
Creating reciprocity for West Virginia small, women and minority-owned businesses who receive such preferences in other states
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Chapter 169, Acts, 2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Approved by Governor 4/1/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/1/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/1/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/31/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/31/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-31 | To Governor 3/31/10 | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 410) | |
2010-03-13 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 409) | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-13 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2010-03-13 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 50) | |
2010-03-13 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 50) | |
2010-03-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-13 | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate reconsidered amendment (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate reconsidered passage of bill (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate reconsidered title amendment (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate reconsidered effective date | |
2010-03-13 | Senate requests return of bill from House | |
2010-03-13 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2010-03-13 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 47) | |
2010-03-13 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 47) | |
2010-03-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-13 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 46) | |
2010-03-13 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-13 | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | Amendment to amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | Committee Amendment Reported | |
2010-03-13 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-13 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-12 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-12 | On 1st reading | |
2010-03-12 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-12 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2010-03-01 | To Finance | |
2010-03-01 | To Finance | |
2010-03-01 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-26 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-02-26 | Passed House (Roll No. 113) | |
2010-02-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-02-26 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-25 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-24 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-02-23 | Do pass | |
2010-02-19 | To House Finance | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-19 | To Finance | |
2010-02-19 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 3 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 3 | 14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 3 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 3 | 21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 24 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 26 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 3 | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 3 | 37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 3 | 37a | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 38 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 39 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 3 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 41 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 42 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 54 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 55 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 55a | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5A | 3 | 59 | New Code | See Bill Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4582&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |