WV HB4554 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-28 - Vetoed by Governor 3/28/08
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-28 - Vetoed by Governor 3/28/08
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow school bus drivers to only be tested once every two years if they are regularly employed as a school bus operator.
Title
Testing school bus operators every other year
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Caputo [D] | Del. Ronald Fragale [D] | Del. Linda Longstreth [D] | Del. Ricky Moye [D] |
Del. Daniel Poling [D] | Del. Dale Stephens [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-28 | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/26/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-26 | To Governor 3/26/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/26/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to House | |
2008-03-08 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 41) | |
2008-03-08 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 41) | |
2008-03-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-08 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-07 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-03-06 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-06 | On 1st reading | |
2008-03-06 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-06 | Reported do pass | |
2008-02-27 | To Education | |
2008-02-27 | To Education | |
2008-02-27 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-26 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-26 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 197) | |
2008-02-26 | Passed House (Roll No. 196) | |
2008-02-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-26 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-25 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-24 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-22 | By substitute, do pass | |
2008-02-14 | To House Education | |
2008-02-14 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-14 | To Education | |
2008-02-14 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4554&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |