WV HB4546 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 66, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to permit parties from two different counties in West Virginia to apply for and be issued a marriage license in any county in this state. The bill puts state residents from different counties on the same basis as two out of state residents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to where an application for a marriage license may be made

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 389) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 220) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17HouseChapter 66, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-27HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/18
2018-03-10HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/15/18 - House Journal
2018-03-15HouseTo Governor 3/15/18
2018-03-10SenateTo Governor 3/15/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2018-03-07SenateCompleted legislative action
2018-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2018-03-07SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 389)
2018-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-07SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-03-05SenateRead 1st time
2018-03-05SenateOn 1st reading
2018-03-03SenateReported do pass
2018-02-27SenateTo Judiciary
2018-02-27SenateTo Judiciary
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-02-27SenateHouse Message received
2018-02-26HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-02-26HousePassed House (Roll No. 220)
2018-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-26HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-23HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-23HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-22HouseRead 1st time
2018-02-22HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-21HouseBy substitute, do pass
2018-02-13HouseTo House Judiciary
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-13HouseTo Judiciary
2018-02-13HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
482102Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback