WV HB4516 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-16 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-16 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing for greater cooperation concerning reports of abuse, neglect or exploitation of vulnerable adults among different entities
Title
Allowing for greater cooperation concerning reports of abuse, neglect or exploitation of vulnerable adults among different entities
Sponsors
Del. Bonnie Brown [D] | Del. Barbara Fleischauer [D] | Del. Barbara Hatfield [D] | Del. Clif Moore [D] |
Del. Don Perdue [D] | Del. Meshea Poore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-02-16 | Do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2012-02-14 | To House Health and Human Resources | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-14 | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary | |
2012-02-14 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB498 (Same As) 2012-03-16 - Approved by Governor 3/30/12 - House Journal
SB548 (Similar To) 2012-02-09 - To Health and Human Resources
SB548 (Similar To) 2012-02-09 - To Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 6 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |