WV HB4496 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 83, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 83, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the allocation of matching funds from future moneys deposited into the West Virginia Research Trust Fund
Title
Providing for the allocation of matching funds from future moneys deposited into the West Virginia Research Trust Fund
Sponsors
Del. Doug Skaff [D] | Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Patrick Lane [R] |
Sen. Eric Nelson [R] | Del. Ronald Fragale [D] | Del. Clif Moore [D] | Del. John McCuskey [R] |
Del. Meshea Poore [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 304) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 216) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 216) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Chapter 83, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-20 | House | To Governor 3/20/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/20/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 304) |
2014-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2014-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 216) |
2014-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2014-02-18 | House | To House Finance |
2014-02-18 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2014-02-13 | House | To House Education |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-13 | House | To Education then Finance |
2014-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB560 (Same As) 2014-02-13 - To Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 18A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 18A | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 18A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 18A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 18A | 3a | New Code | See Bill Text |
18B | 18A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18B | 18A | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |