WV HB4496 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-06 - House Message received
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-06 - House Message received
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for the voluntary transfer of assets from the Teachers' Defined Contribution Retirement System ("TDC") to the State Teachers Retirement System ("TRS"); to provide an election on the question of actively contributing members of the TDC voluntarily transferring assets to the TRS; requiring seventy percent of actively contributing members of the TDC to vote in the affirmative; to permit the voluntary transfer of assets upon affirmative vote; providing for transferring members to receive service credit in TRS for an amount equal to seventy-five percent of the members' service credit to the TDC; and providing transferring members the option to receive full credit in TRS by paying the Actuarial Reserve.
Title
Providing opportunities for members of the Teachers' Defined Contribution Retirement System ("TDC") to the State Teachers Retirement System ("TRS")
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-06 | House Message received | |
2008-03-05 | To conference | |
2008-03-05 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-05 | House appointed conferees: Boggs, Kominar, Campbell, Spencer, Anderson | |
2008-03-05 | House agreed to conference | |
2008-03-05 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-05 | Communicated to House | |
2008-03-05 | Senate appoints conference committee: Helmick, Foster, Plymale, Oliverio, Hall | |
2008-03-05 | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-04 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-04 | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) | |
2008-03-04 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-04 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2008-03-04 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 11) | |
2008-03-04 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 11) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate reconsidered passage of bill (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate reconsidered title amendment and adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate reconsidered effective date | |
2008-03-04 | Motion | |
2008-03-04 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 10) | |
2008-03-04 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 10) | |
2008-03-04 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-04 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-03 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-03 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-03 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-03-03 | Reported do pass, with amendment | |
2008-03-03 | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 2/28/08 | |
2008-02-28 | On second reading to Finance | |
2008-02-28 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-28 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-28 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-28 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-02-28 | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance | |
2008-02-22 | To Pensions | |
2008-02-22 | To Pensions then Finance | |
2008-02-22 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-21 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-21 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 89) | |
2008-02-21 | Passed House (Roll No. 88) | |
2008-02-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-21 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-20 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-19 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-19 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-18 | By substitute, do pass | |
2008-02-14 | To House Finance | |
2008-02-14 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-02-11 | To House Pensions and Retirement | |
2008-02-11 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-11 | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance | |
2008-02-11 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB642 (Same As) 2008-02-11 - To Pensions
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4496&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |