WV HB4489 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-12 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-12 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to eliminating existing criminal offense and penalties for human trafficking. The bill creates felony offenses and penalties for trafficking an individual. The bill defines terms. The bill creates felony offenses and penalties for using an individual in forced labor. The bill creates felony offenses and penalties for using an individual in debt bondage. The bill creates felony offenses and penalties for compelling an adult through coercion to engage in commercial sexual activity. The bill creates a felony offense for maintaining or making available a minor for the purpose of engaging in commercial sexual activity. The bill clarifies that consent of minor and misbelief as to age are not defenses to prosecution for sexual servitude offense. The bill creates a felony offense of patronizing an individual to engage in commercial sexual activity. The bill clarifies that each victim shall be considered a separate offense. The bill limits ability for parole in circumstances where the court makes a finding of aggravated circumstances. The bill defines aggravated circumstances. The bill provides for restitution to victims and the enforcement of a judgment order for restitution. The bill directs unclaimed restitution to be paid to the Crime Victims Compensation Fund. The bill provides for disgorgement of profits and debarment from state and local government contracts. The bill makes victims eligible for compensation under the Crime Victims Compensation Fund. The bill provides for criminal immunity for offense of prostitution if individual was a minor at time of offense and was a victim at time of offense. The bill provides for expungement of prostitution conviction for victims of trafficking. The bill authorizes law enforcement to use wiretaps to conduct investigations. The bill also designates the Division of Justice and Community Services to be the state administrative agency responsible for criminal justice and juvenile justice systems for the planning and development of state programs and grants relating to human trafficking.
Title
Relating generally to human trafficking
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 661) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment with amendment (Roll No. 660) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 342) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 163) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment with amendment (Roll No. 660) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 342) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 163) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 661) |
2016-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment with amendment (Roll No. 660) |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 342) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2016-02-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-24 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 163) |
2016-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-20 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-19 | House | Do pass |
2016-02-11 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-11 | House | To Judiciary |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 9A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 14 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 14 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 14 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 14 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 14 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 14 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 14 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 14 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 14 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 2 | 17 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
62 | 1D | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |