WV HB4455 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-08 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-08 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit the retail sale of wine by licensed wineries and farm wineries between the hours of ten thirty a.m. and 1:00 p.m. on Sundays, and to permit the retail sale of alcoholic liquors manufactured and sold by licensed distilleries and mini-distilleries on Sundays, beginning at 10:30 a.m. The bill would also permit licensed wineries, farm wineries, distilleries and mini-distilleries to offer complimentary samples for consumption on premises on Sundays, beginning at 10:30 a.m. Finally, the bill would permit distilleries and mini-distilleries which produce less than 50,000 gallons of alcoholic liquor per year to seek and hold a separate license for a private club located on the premises of the distillery or mini-distillery.
Title
Relating to the sale of wine and alcoholic liquors by licensed wineries, farm wineries, distilleries and mini-distilleries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 33) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 33) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 32) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 32) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 120) (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 33) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 32) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 32) (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 120) (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2014-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 33) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 33) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2014-02-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-20 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-20 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 120) |
2014-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-20 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-18 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-17 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2014-02-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-10 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 4 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 4 | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 4 | 3b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 6 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |