WV HB4447 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 282, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 282, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the shared table initiative for senior citizens who suffer from food insecurity
Title
Creating the shared table initiative for senior citizens who suffer from food insecurity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 519) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 316) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 316) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 282, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 519) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 3rd |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Returned to calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-26 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-26 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 316) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-13 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-02-13 | House | Do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2020-01-21 | House | To House Senior, Children, and Family Issues |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-21 | House | To Senior, Children, and Family Issues then Government Organization |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB93 (Similar To) 2020-01-08 - To Government Organization