WV HB4439 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 335, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 335, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying the method for calculating the amount of severance tax attributable to the increase in coal production
Title
Clarifying the method for calculating the amount of severance tax attributable to the increase in coal production
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 730) (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 500) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 341) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 500) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 341) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 335, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 730) |
2020-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Blair Title amendment adopted |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Finance Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 500) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Returned to calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 341) |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-02-12 | House | To House Finance |
2020-02-12 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2020-01-21 | House | To House Energy |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-21 | House | To Energy then Finance |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13EE | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 13EE | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13EE | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |