WV HB4428 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 183, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 183, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit an oral pharmaceutical certified licensee, certified optometrist, to prescribe hydrocodone and hydrocodone containing drugs, for a duration of no more than three days.
Title
Clarifying that optometrists may continue to exercise the same prescriptive authority which they possessed prior to hydrocodone being reclassified
Sponsors
Del. Eric Householder [R] | Del. Larry Faircloth [R] | Del. Ralph Rodighiero [D] | Del. Denise Campbell [D] |
Del. David Perry [D] | Del. Brad White [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 489) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 290) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 290) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 183, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/2016 - House Journal |
2016-04-01 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 489) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-03-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 290) |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2016-02-26 | House | Do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | To House Select Committee on Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse |
2016-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-08 | House | To Select Committee on Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse then Health and Human Resources |
2016-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 8 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |