WV HB4422 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Approved by Governor 3/25/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The Patient Brokering Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Patient Brokering Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 746) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 549) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 252) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/19/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-07HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 746)
2020-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-07SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-07SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 549)
2020-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-07SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-03-06SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-06SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-05SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2020-03-03SenateOn 2nd reading to Judiciary
2020-03-03SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-03SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-03SenateReported do pass, but first to Judiciary
2020-02-21SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2020-02-21SenateTo Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
2020-02-21SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-20HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-20HousePassed House (Roll No. 252)
2020-02-20HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-20HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-19HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-19HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-18HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-18HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-17HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-31HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-01-31HouseDo pass, but first to Judiciary
2020-01-20HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2020-01-20HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-20HouseTo Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
2020-01-20HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16601New CodeSee Bill Text
16602New CodeSee Bill Text
16603New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback