WV HB4416 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Chapter 29, Acts, 2010
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Chapter 29, Acts, 2010
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide payment to certain claimants who provided commodities and/or services to the state, but who were not paid because the agency involved overspent its budget. Total amount of general revenue - $10,221.65
Title
Declaring certain claims against the state and its agencies to be moral obligations of the state and directing payments thereof
Sponsors
Del. William Anderson [R] | Del. Kevin Craig [D] | Del. Allen Evans [R] | Del. Richard Iaquinta [D] |
Del. Timothy Manchin [D] | Del. Charlene Marshall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Chapter 29, Acts, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/26/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-26 | Approved by Governor 3/26/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/26/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/25/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/25/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-25 | To Governor 3/25/10 | |
2010-03-11 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 336) | |
2010-03-13 | House concurred in Senate effective date (Voice) | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-11 | Communicated to House | |
2010-03-11 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 16) | |
2010-03-11 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) | |
2010-03-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-11 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-10 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-09 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-09 | On 1st reading | |
2010-03-08 | Reported do pass | |
2010-02-22 | To Finance | |
2010-02-22 | To Finance | |
2010-02-22 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-19 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-02-19 | Passed House (Roll No. 59) | |
2010-02-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-02-19 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-18 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-18 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-17 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-17 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Do pass | |
2010-02-09 | To House Finance | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-09 | To Finance | |
2010-02-09 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB526 (Similar To) 2010-03-13 - Effective Date
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4416&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |