WV HB4415 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Approved by Governor 3/25/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to missing and endangered children

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to missing and endangered children

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 547) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 430) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 103) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-19HouseTo Governor 3/19/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-06SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-05HouseCompleted legislative action
2020-03-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-05HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 547)
2020-03-05HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-04SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-04SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 430)
2020-03-04SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-04SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-03-03SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-03SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenateRead 1st time
2020-03-02SenateImmediate consideration
2020-03-02Senate2nd reference dispensed
2020-03-02SenateReported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance
2020-02-06SenateTo Children and Families
2020-02-06SenateTo Children and Families then Finance
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-05HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-05HousePassed House (Roll No. 103)
2020-02-05HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-05HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-04HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-04HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-03HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-03HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-31HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-20HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2020-01-20HouseDo pass, but first to Health and Human Resources
2020-01-20HouseOriginating in House Senior, Children, and Family Issues

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
153D3Amended CodeCitation Text
153D9New CodeSee Bill Text
496103Amended CodeCitation Text
496105Amended CodeCitation Text
496106Amended CodeCitation Text
496110Amended CodeCitation Text
496112Amended CodeCitation Text
496113Amended CodeCitation Text
496114Amended CodeCitation Text
496116New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback