WV HB4411 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-20 - To Judiciary
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-20 - To Judiciary
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to exempt land-based finfish aquaculture facilities from certain sludge management requirements.
Title
Exempting land-based finfish aquaculture facilities from certain sludge management requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-20 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-20 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-20 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-19 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-19 | Passed House (Roll No. 75) | |
2008-02-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-19 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-18 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-18 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-15 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-15 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-14 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2008-02-14 | Do pass | |
2008-02-05 | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2008-02-05 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-05 | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary | |
2008-02-05 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4411&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |