WV HB4409 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 298, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 298, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to transferring remaining funds from the Volunteer Fire Department Workers' Compensation Premium Subsidy Fund
Title
Relating to transferring remaining funds from the Volunteer Fire Department Workers' Compensation Premium Subsidy Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 611) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 428) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 313) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 428) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 313) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 298, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 611) |
2020-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 428) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment |
2020-02-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-02-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 313) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | Do pass |
2020-01-24 | House | To House Finance |
2020-01-24 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2020-01-17 | House | To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-17 | House | To Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Finance |
2020-01-17 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 3 | 33a | Amended Code | Citation Text |