WV HB4407 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Rereferred to Education on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to remove one of the requirements for eligibility for an alternative program teacher certificate. The requirement that would be removed is that the person have an academic major or occupational area the same as or similar to subject matter he or she is being hired to teach.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to eligibility for alternative program teacher certificate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 94) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateRereferred to Education on 2nd reading
2018-03-07SenateRead 1st time
2018-03-07SenateImmediate consideration
2018-03-07SenateWithout recommendation, but first rereferred to Education
2018-02-14SenateTo Education
2018-02-14SenateTo Education
2018-02-14SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-02-14SenateHouse Message received
2018-02-13HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-02-13HousePassed House (Roll No. 94)
2018-02-13HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-13HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-12HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-12HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-09HouseRead 1st time
2018-02-09HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-08HouseBy substitute, do pass
2018-02-02HouseTo House Education
2018-02-02HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-02HouseTo Education
2018-02-02HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18A31fAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback