WV HB4381 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to enact the West Virginia Consumer Privacy Act of 2024.
Title
West Virginia Consumer Privacy Act of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 188) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-02-15 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 188) |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-15 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-15 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-15 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar |
2024-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2024-01-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-10 | House | To Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46A | 9 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 9 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
46A | 9 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |