WV HB4372 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to raise the number of years of service where teachers stop getting raises from 35 to 40 years.
Title
To increase the 35 year limit on interval pay raises for teachers to 40 years
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | To House Finance |
2024-01-24 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2024-01-17 | House | Do pass, but first to Education |
2024-01-10 | House | To House Economic Development and Tourism |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-10 | House | To Economic Development and Tourism then Finance |
2024-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18A | 4 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |