WV HB4372 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 66, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 66, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit the Commissioner of Financial Institutions to file certain reports, data or information directly with the Division of Financial Institutions. The bill permits the commissioner to determine when those reports, data or information are filed. The bill states that in addition to the reports not being public records, the filed data and information are also not public records.
Title
Permitting the Commissioner of Financial Institutions to require the filing of certain reports, data or information directly with the Division of Financial Institutions
Sponsors
Del. Clif Moore [D] | Del. Denise Campbell [D] | Del. Douglas Reynolds [D] | Del. Tom Azinger [R] |
Sen. Eric Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 21) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 108) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 108) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Chapter 66, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-08 | House | Approved by Governor 3/7/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/7/14 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/7/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-05 | Senate | To Governor 3/5/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-05 | House | To Governor 3/5/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-05 | House | To Governor 3/5/14 |
2014-02-25 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 21) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-19 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 108) |
2014-02-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-19 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-18 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-17 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-17 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-14 | House | Do pass |
2014-02-06 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2014-01-29 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2014-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-01-29 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2014-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | 17 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |