WV HB4360 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 22, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 22, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to consumer credit protection
Title
Relating to consumer credit protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 471) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 38) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 208) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 38) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 208) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Chapter 22, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-28 | House | To Governor 3/28/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 471) |
2014-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 38) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 208) |
2014-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2014-02-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-20 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2014-01-28 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-01-28 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2014-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46A | 2 | 122 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46A | 2 | 128 | Amended Code | Citation Text |