WV HB4353 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 247, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 247, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a rational nexus requirement between prior criminal conduct and initial licensure decision making
Title
Creating a rational nexus requirement between prior criminal conduct and initial licensure decision making
Sponsors
Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. Eric Porterfield [R] | Del. Joe Jeffries [R] | Del. John Paul Hott [R] |
Del. Larry Kump [R] | Del. Scott Cadle [R] | Del. Terrishie Sypolt [R] | Del. Danny Hamrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 229) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 174) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 64) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 174) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 64) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 247, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Approved by Governor 3/5/20 |
2020-03-06 | House | Approved by Governor 3/5/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/5/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-02-28 | House | To Governor 2/28/20 - House Journal |
2020-02-28 | House | To Governor 2/28/20 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | To Governor 2/28/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-02-20 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-02-19 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-19 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 229) |
2020-02-19 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 174) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 2/14/20 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2020-01-31 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-01-31 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-30 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-01-30 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 64) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-30 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-28 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-27 | House | Do pass |
2020-01-15 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-15 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB499 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 6 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 23 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 1 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 14 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 16 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 2 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 5 | 5c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22A | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22B | 502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22C | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 22D | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31 | 17A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
32A | 2 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13C | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13C | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |