WV HB4347 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to affirmative defenses against mechanics' liens
Title
Relating to affirmative defenses against mechanics' liens
Sponsors
Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Isaac Sponaugle [D] | Del. Kelli Sobonya [R] | Del. Timothy Manchin [D] |
Del. Patrick Lane [R] | Del. Meshea Poore [D] | Del. John Pino [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 36) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 85) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 85) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/1/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-28 | House | To Governor 3/28/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 36) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 3/5/14 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary on 2nd reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Motion |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Reported without recommendation |
2014-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-17 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-17 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 85) |
2014-02-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-17 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-12 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2014-01-28 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-01-28 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB568 (Similar To) 2014-02-13 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
38 | 2 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |