WV HB4343 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 30, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 30, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit the digital delivery of publication of a bank’s most recent year end audited financial statements to their shareholders at or prior to their annual meeting.
Title
Relating to the delivery of financial statements to bank shareholders
Sponsors
Del. Cindy Frich [R] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] | Del. Brad White [R] | Del. Jill Upson [R] |
Del. Chad Lovejoy [D] | Del. Andrew Robinson [D] | Del. Allen Evans [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 315) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 140) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 140) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 30, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/10/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/10/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 315) |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-19 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-16 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 140) |
2018-02-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-16 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-15 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-14 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-13 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-02-05 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-29 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2018-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-29 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2018-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31A | 4 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |