WV HB4338 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-21 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-21 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reducing annual permit fee for each video lottery terminal owned or leased by a limited video lottery licensee
Title
Reducing annual permit fee for each video lottery terminal owned or leased by a limited video lottery licensee
Sponsors
Del. Marty Gearheart [R] | Del. Doug Smith [R] | Del. Mark Zatezalo [R] | Del. Danny Hamrick [R] |
Del. Geoff Foster [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-18 - House - Effective May 1, 2022 (Roll No. 172) (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 169) (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 169) (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-21 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-18 | House | Effective May 1, 2022 (Roll No. 172) |
2022-02-18 | House | House further considered bill |
2022-02-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 169) |
2022-02-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Do pass |
2022-01-21 | House | To House Finance |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-21 | House | To Finance |
2022-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 22B | 1103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |