WV HB4314 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit the sale of pure caffeine products and to prohibit the sale of powdered or crystalline alcohol for human consumption.
Title
Prohibiting the sale of powdered or crystalline alcohol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 588) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 424) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 289) (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 424) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 289) (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 588) |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 424) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-03-02 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-03-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 289) |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-02-03 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-02-03 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2016-01-27 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-27 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2016-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 1 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 3 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 6 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 6 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 6 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 10 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 6 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 6 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |