WV HB4311 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating criminal penalties for illegal voting activity
Title
Creating criminal penalties for illegal voting activity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 574) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 409) (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 75) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 409) (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 75) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 115, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-17 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-11 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 574) |
2022-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 409) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2022-02-07 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-07 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 75) |
2022-02-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-31 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-21 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-21 | House | To Judiciary |
2022-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 9 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |