WV HB4281 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-20 - Vetoed by Governor 3/30/10 - Senate Journal
Status: Vetoed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-20 - Vetoed by Governor 3/30/10 - Senate Journal
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove references to "mentally retarded" and "mental retardation" in healthcare-related legislation and replace those references with "intellectually disabled," "individual with an intellectual disability" and "intellectual disability.
Title
Replacing references to "mental retardation" with "intellectual disability"
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Ashley [R] | Del. Larry Border [R] | Del. John Ellem [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] |
Sen. Mark Hunt [D] | Del. Patrick Lane [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. Carol Miller [R] |
Del. Daniel Poling [D] | Del. Larry Williams [D] | Del. William Wooton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-20 | Vetoed by Governor 3/30/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-20 | Vetoed by Governor 3/30/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-30 | Vetoed by Governor 3/30/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/29/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/29/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/10 | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 403) | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-12 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2010-03-12 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 39) | |
2010-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-12 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 38) | |
2010-03-12 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-12 | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-12 | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-12 | Committee Amendment Reported | |
2010-03-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-12 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-11 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-11 | On 1st reading | |
2010-03-11 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-11 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2010-02-16 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-16 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-16 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-15 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-02-15 | Passed House (Roll No. 42) | |
2010-02-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-02-15 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-12 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-11 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-11 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-02-10 | By substitute, do pass | |
2010-02-02 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-02 | To Judiciary | |
2010-02-02 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4281&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |