WV HB4262 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to licensure for polygraph examiners
Title
Relating to licensure for polygraph examiners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 201) (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-23 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 201) |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2022-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/15/22 |
2022-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-19 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-19 | House | To Government Organization |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 5 | 5A | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 5 | 5B | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 5 | 5c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 5 | 5D | Amended Code | Citation Text |