WV HB4236 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 110, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 110, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove the exemption of reporting real property by certain agencies to the Real Estate Division, streamline the data reported by agencies, and allow for a report to the Governor and Legislature those agencies that fail to meet reporting requirements.
Title
Requiring agencies to provide an annual inventory of real property holdings to the Real Estate Division
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 312) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 70) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 70) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 110, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/10/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/10/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 312) |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-12 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-02-12 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 70) |
2018-02-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-08 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-07 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-06 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-22 | House | To House Government Organization |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-22 | House | To Government Organization |
2018-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB342 (Similar To) 2018-01-23 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 10 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |