WV HB4210 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-18 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-18 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require the Public Employees Insurance Agency Finance Board to have a quorum of five members present at any public hearing conducted by the board.
Title
Requiring the Public Employees Insurance Agency Finance Board to have a quorum of five members present at any public hearing
Sponsors
Del. Larry Barker [D] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Del. John Doyle [D] | Del. Timothy Manchin [D] |
Del. Ricky Moye [D] | Del. Stan Shaver [D] | Del. Margaret Staggers [D] | Del. Dale Stephens [D] |
Del. Larry Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | To Government Organization | |
2010-02-18 | To Government Organization | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-02-17 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-02-17 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 52) | |
2010-02-17 | Passed House (Roll No. 51) | |
2010-02-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-02-17 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-16 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-02-15 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-15 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-02-12 | By substitute, do pass | |
2010-01-28 | To House Government Organization | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced in House | |
2010-01-28 | To Government Organization | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 16 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4210&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |