WV HB4188 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a program to develop and implement a program to facilitate commercial sponsorship of rest areas and welcome centers on controlled-access highway facilities. The bill also creates the Legislative Oversight Commission on Controlled-access Facilities Sponsorship to investigate, study and review the development and implementation of the program.
Title
Relating to the development and implementation of a program to facilitate commercial sponsorship of rest areas
Sponsors
Del. Danny Hamrick [R] | Del. George Ambler [R] | Del. Brent Boggs [D] | Del. Scott Cadle [R] |
Del. Nancy Peoples Guthrie [D] | Del. Linda Longstreth [D] | Del. Matthew Rohrbach [R] | Del. Marty Gearheart [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 78) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 3rd reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/8/16 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-02-24 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2016-02-16 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2016-02-16 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-16 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 78) |
2016-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-11 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-10 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-01-20 | House | To House Finance |
2016-01-20 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2016-01-20 | House | Originating in House Roads and Transportation |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 4 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 4 | 56 | New Code | See Bill Text |