WV HB4158 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing a person to manufacture a stated amount of alcoholic liquor for personal consumption
Title
Allowing a person to manufacture a stated amount of alcoholic liquor for personal consumption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 172) (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-14 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 172) |
2020-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-10 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-14 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-14 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |