WV HB4134 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-27 - To Judiciary
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-27 - To Judiciary
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit the sale of less than twenty packaged cigarettes. It requires federally mandated warnings on all cigarettes sold. And, the bill provides a misdemeanor penalty of a fine of $250.00 for violations.
Title
Prohibiting the sale of less than twenty packaged cigarettes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-27 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-27 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-27 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-26 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-26 | Passed House (Roll No. 169) | |
2008-02-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-26 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-25 | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-25 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-24 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-22 | Do pass | |
2008-01-23 | To House Judiciary | |
2008-01-23 | Introduced in House | |
2008-01-23 | To Judiciary | |
2008-01-23 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4134&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |