WV HB4132 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-26 - To Judiciary
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-26 - To Judiciary
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit employers from mandated captive meetings with their employees on political or religious matters. The bill provides a prohibition on these meetings and allows employees to recover damages for any adverse actions taken against them for refusal to participate in such meetings.
Title
Prohibiting employers from mandating captive meetings with their employees relating to political matters
Sponsors
Del. Mike Burdiss [D] | Del. John Ellem [R] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Del. Virginia Mahan [D] |
Del. Alex Shook [D] | Del. Carrie Webster [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-26 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-26 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2008-02-26 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-25 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-25 | Passed House (Roll No. 106) | |
2008-02-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-25 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-24 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-22 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-22 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-21 | By substitute, do pass | |
2008-01-22 | To House Judiciary | |
2008-01-22 | Introduced in House | |
2008-01-22 | To Judiciary | |
2008-01-22 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4132&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |