WV HB4094 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 176, Acts, 2008
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 176, Acts, 2008
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize state agencies to condition compensation paid to employees for job-related training, education or professional development on continued employment with the state agency.
Title
Relating to reimbursement of compensation paid to certain state employees for job-related training, education or professional development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 176, Acts, 2008 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/31/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/31/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-25 | To Governor 3/25/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/25/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/25/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-08 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 471) | |
2008-03-08 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-07 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2008-03-07 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 23) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-07 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 22) | |
2008-03-07 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-07 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-03-07 | Rearranged on Calendar by Rules Committee | |
2008-03-06 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2008-03-06 | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 3/3/08 | |
2008-03-03 | On second reading to Finance | |
2008-03-03 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-03 | On 1st reading | |
2008-03-03 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-03 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-03-03 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-02-27 | To Government Organization | |
2008-02-27 | To Government Organization then Finance | |
2008-02-27 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-02-26 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-26 | Passed House (Roll No. 166) | |
2008-02-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-26 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2008-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-25 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2008-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-24 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-24 | By substitute, do pass | |
2008-02-18 | To House Finance | |
2008-02-18 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance | |
2008-01-21 | To House Government Organization | |
2008-01-21 | Introduced in House | |
2008-01-21 | To Government Organization then Finance | |
2008-01-21 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB264 (Same As) 2008-01-18 - To Government Organization
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4094&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |