WV HB4089 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring cursive writing to be taught
Title
Requiring cursive writing to be taught
Sponsors
Del. Rodney Pyles [D] | Del. Eric Porterfield [R] | Del. Tom Fast [R] | Del. Daniel Linville [R] |
Del. Kenneth Hicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 48) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | To Education |
2020-01-29 | Senate | To Education |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-01-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 48) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-23 | House | Do pass |
2020-01-10 | House | To House Education |
2020-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-10 | House | To Education |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |