WV HB4078 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 20, Acts, 2008
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-08 - Chapter 20, Acts, 2008
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to terminate the Blennerhassett Island Historical State Park Commission. The termination is exempt from the wind down provisions of §4-10-12. The powers of the commission are transferred to the Division of Natural Resources.
Title
Relating to the termination of the Blennerhassett Island Historical State Park Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-08 | Chapter 20, Acts, 2008 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-27 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/27/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-17 | To Governor 3/17/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/17/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/17/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-07 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-07 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-07 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 401) | |
2008-03-07 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-06 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2008-03-06 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 27) | |
2008-03-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-06 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 26) | |
2008-03-06 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-06 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-06 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2008-03-05 | On 1st reading | |
2008-03-05 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-05 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-03-05 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2008-01-29 | To Government Organization | |
2008-01-29 | To Government Organization | |
2008-01-29 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-01-28 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-28 | Passed House (Roll No. 17) | |
2008-01-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-01-28 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2008-01-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-01-25 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2008-01-24 | Read 1st time | |
2008-01-24 | On 1st reading, House Calendar | |
2008-01-23 | Do pass | |
2008-01-17 | To House Government Organization | |
2008-01-17 | Introduced in House | |
2008-01-17 | To Government Organization | |
2008-01-17 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4078&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |