WV HB4062 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 172, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 172, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create an in-home direct care workforce registry to detail qualifications and experience of in-home direct care workers in West Virginia.
Title
Creating an in-home direct care workforce registry
Sponsors
Del. Denise Campbell [D] | Del. Samuel Cann [D] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Del. Ricky Moye [D] |
Del. Don Perdue [D] | Del. John Pino [D] | Del. Dale Stephens [D] | Del. David Walker [D] |
Del. Larry Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 383) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 51) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 50) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 23) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 51) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 50) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 23) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 172, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/22/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-22 | Approved by Governor 3/22/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/22/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-19 | To Governor 3/19/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/19/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/19/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-10 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 383) | |
2012-03-10 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-09 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2012-03-09 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 51) | |
2012-03-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-09 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 50) | |
2012-03-09 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-09 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-09 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-08 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-07 | Reported do pass, with amendment | |
2012-03-02 | To Judiciary | |
2012-03-02 | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Judiciary | |
2012-02-02 | To Finance | |
2012-02-02 | To Finance then Judiciary | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-02 | House Message received | |
2012-02-01 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-01 | Passed House (Roll No. 23) | |
2012-02-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-01 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2012-01-31 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-01-31 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2012-01-30 | Read 1st time | |
2012-01-30 | On 1st reading, House Calendar | |
2012-01-27 | By substitute, do pass | |
2012-01-20 | To House Finance | |
2012-01-20 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2012-01-20 | With amendment, do pass | |
2012-01-13 | To House Senior Citizen Issues | |
2012-01-13 | Introduced in House | |
2012-01-13 | To Senior Citizen Issues then Government Organization | |
2012-01-13 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB171 (Same As) 2012-01-18 - Referred to Finance