WV HB4052 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-16 - Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 4079
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-16 - Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 4079
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Board of Veterinary Medicine to promulgate a legislative rule relating to certified animal euthanasia technicians.
Title
Board of Veterinary Medicine, rule relating to certified animal euthanasia technicians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 4079 |
2018-01-19 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-19 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-01-15 | House | To House Government Organization |
2018-01-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-15 | House | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2018-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB219 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 9 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |