WV HB4012 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 133, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 133, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to adopt the Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts (Uniform Law Commission, 2010) to replace both the current Uniform Notary Act (1984) and the Uniform Recognition of Acknowledgments Act (1971). The bill was recommended for introduction and passage during the Regular Session of the Legislature by the Commission on Interstate Cooperation.
Title
Relating to the Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts
Sponsors
Del. Margaret Smith [D] | Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] | Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. Michael Ferro [D] |
Del. Douglas Reynolds [D] | Del. Stephen Skinner [D] | Del. Erikka Storch [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 298) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 297) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 2) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 175) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 297) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 2) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 175) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Chapter 133, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-28 | House | To Governor 3/28/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 298) |
2014-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 297) |
2014-03-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2014 (Roll No. 2) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 2) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | Senate | To Interstate Cooperation |
2014-02-27 | Senate | To Interstate Cooperation then Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 175) |
2014-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2014-01-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-01-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB4 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 4 | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 4 | 13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 4 | 14 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 4 | 15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 4 | 16 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 4 | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 4 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 4 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 4 | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 4 | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 1 | 101 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 1 | 102 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 1 | 103 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 1 | 104 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 1 | 105 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 1 | 106 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 1 | 107 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 2 | 201 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 2 | 202 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 2 | 203 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 2 | 204 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 2 | 205 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 2 | 206 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 2 | 207 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 2 | 208 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 2 | 301 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 3 | 101 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 3 | 102 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 4 | 101 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 4 | 102 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 4 | 103 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 4 | 104 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 4 | 201 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 4 | 202 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 4 | 203 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 4 | 301 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 4 | 401 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 4 | 402 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 4 | 403 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 4 | 405 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 5 | 101 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 5 | 102 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 5 | 103 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 5 | 104 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 6 | 101 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 6 | 103 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 6 | 201 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 6 | 202 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 6 | 203 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 6 | 204 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 7 | 101 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 7 | 201 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 7 | 202 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 8 | 101 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29C | 9 | 101 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 1 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 1A | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 1A | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 1A | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 1A | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 1A | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 1A | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 1A | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 1A | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 1A | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
39 | 4 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 38 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 4 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 5 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
59 | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |