WV HB4007 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To reduce personal income tax rates
Title
To reduce personal income tax rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 118) (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 107) (Y: 21 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 106) (Y: 22 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 105) (Y: 37 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 107) (Y: 21 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 106) (Y: 22 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 105) (Y: 37 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 118) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 107) |
2022-02-10 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 106) |
2022-02-10 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 105) |
2022-02-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-03 | House | To House Finance |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-03 | House | To Finance |
2022-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 4g | New Code | See Bill Text |
11B | 2 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11B | 2 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |