WV HB4001 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating West Virginia Impact Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating West Virginia Impact Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18HouseOn 3rd reading, House Calendar
2020-02-05HouseFrom Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
2020-02-04HouseOn 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar
2020-02-03HouseAmendment pending
2020-02-03HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-03HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-31HouseRead 1st time
2020-01-31HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-30HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-08HouseTo House Finance
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-08HouseTo Finance
2020-01-08HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
126E1New CodeSee Bill Text
126E10New CodeSee Bill Text
126E11New CodeSee Bill Text
126E12New CodeSee Bill Text
126E13New CodeSee Bill Text
126E14New CodeSee Bill Text
126E15New CodeSee Bill Text
126E16New CodeSee Bill Text
126E17New CodeSee Bill Text
126E18New CodeSee Bill Text
126E19New CodeSee Bill Text
126E2New CodeSee Bill Text
126E3New CodeSee Bill Text
126E4New CodeSee Bill Text
126E5New CodeSee Bill Text
126E6New CodeSee Bill Text
126E7New CodeSee Bill Text
126E8New CodeSee Bill Text
126E9New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback