WV HB3304 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 67, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 67, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation to establisha Reentry and Transitional Housing Program
Title
Authorizing the Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation to establish a Reentry and Transitional Housing Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 477) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 478) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 614) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 613) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 429) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 340) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 478) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 614) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 613) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 429) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 340) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 67, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-21 | House | To Governor 4/21/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/21/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/21/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 477) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House effective date |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-10 | House | House requests Senate to concur in changed effective date |
2021-04-10 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 614) |
2021-04-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 613) |
2021-04-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 429) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Unanimous consent to amend |
2021-04-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance |
2021-03-31 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-31 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-30 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-30 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 340) |
2021-03-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-30 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-25 | House | Originating in House Judiciary |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15A | 4A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 4A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 4A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 4A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 4A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 4A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15A | 4A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |