WV HB3139 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 205, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 205, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to funding of the Public Employees Health Insurance Program
Title
Relating to funding of the Public Employees Health Insurance Program
Sponsors
Del. Vernon Criss [R] | Del. Joe Ellington [R] | Del. William Hartman [D] | Del. Mick Bates [D] |
Sen. Jason Barrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 557) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 557) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 741) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 740) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 508) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 508) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 345) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 344) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 304) (Y: 42 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 557) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 741) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 740) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 508) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 508) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 345) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 344) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 304) (Y: 42 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 205, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 557) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 557) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 741) |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 740) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 508) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 508) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 345) |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 344) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 304) |
2019-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-22 | House | Originating in House Finance |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11B | 2 | 15a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 16 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 16 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |