WV HB3134 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB3134
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing criminal penalties for negligent homicide, and increasing criminal penalties for reckless driving
Title
Establishing criminal penalties for negligent homicide, and increasing criminal penalties for reckless driving
Sponsors
Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Ray Hollen [R] | Del. Joseph Canestraro [D] | Del. Brandon Steele [R] |
Del. Andrew Byrd [D] | Del. Jason Harshbarger [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 297) (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 297) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-25 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/25/19 |
2019-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-20 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-19 | House | Originating in House Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB3134 (Carry Over) 2019-02-26 - To Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |